NH HB1386 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/18/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97115570558 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/18/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97115570558 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to employment protection for qualified patients of New Hampshire's therapeutic cannabis program.
Title
Relative to employment protection for qualified patients of New Hampshire's therapeutic cannabis program.
Sponsors
Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] | Rep. Edith DesMarais [D] | Rep. Wendy Chase [D] | Rep. Timothy Josephson [D] |
Rep. Kathryn Stack [D] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] | Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/18/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97115570558 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-03-12 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 163 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 66 |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/25/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 104 |
2020-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 1 P. 20 |