NH HB1388 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
Pending: House Environment and Agriculture Committee
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 1:30 pm in Legislative Office Building 305-307
Hearing: Mar 3 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the sale of cats, dogs, and rabbits in retail stores.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the sale of cats, dogs, and rabbits in retail stores.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2020-02-18HousePublic Hearing: 02/25/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2020-01-22House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Environment and Agriculture

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback