NH HB139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 21; Eff: 07/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 21; Eff: 07/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to restrictions on smoking in state forests, parks, land, or buildings operated by the department of natural and cultural resources.
Title
Relative to restrictions on smoking in state forests, parks, land, or buildings operated by the department of natural and cultural resources.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Leishman [D] | Rep. Ivy Vann [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 21; Eff: 07/14/2019 |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 42 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/18/2019; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0736h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 62 |
2019-03-20 | House | Amendment # 2019-0736h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 62 |
2019-03-19 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Edwards) 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0736h (NT) for 03/19/2019 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 11 |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 39 |