NH HB1390 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Using a portion of meals and rooms revenues for fish and game search and rescue operations.
Title
Using a portion of meals and rooms revenues for fish and game search and rescue operations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 17 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 18 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 9 |