NH HB1401 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting smoking and e-cigarettes in motor vehicles when a passenger is under 16 years of age.
Title
Prohibiting smoking and e-cigarettes in motor vehicles when a passenger is under 16 years of age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - OTPA (Y: 174 N: 109 NV: 68 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0379h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 174-109 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 199 |
2020-03-13 | House | Amendment # 2020-0379h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 199 |
2020-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0379h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 75 |
2020-02-18 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-02-05 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 20 |