NH HB1407 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Libertarian 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 70; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Libertarian 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 70; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the prohibition on the use of milk containers.
Title
Repealing the prohibition on the use of milk containers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 70; Eff. 7/24/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/13/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 5 |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 8 |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/16/2018 Legislative Office Building 303 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 9 |