NH HB1411 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Rules Suspension to allow action at the present time Motion Failed not getting required 2/3 DV 190-138 06/11/2020 House Journal 8 P. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Rules Suspension to allow action at the present time Motion Failed not getting required 2/3 DV 190-138 06/11/2020 House Journal 8 P. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study long-term supports and services in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a commission to study long-term supports and services in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Van Houten [D] | Rep. Rebecca Mcbeath [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Rep. Heidi Hamer [D] | Rep. Kristina Fargo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Rules Suspension to allow action at the present time Motion Failed not getting required 2/3 DV 190-138 06/11/2020 House Journal 8 P. 32 |
2020-06-02 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 7 |
2020-03-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-03-10 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/17/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-27 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 15 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0434h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 15 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0434h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 15 |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0434h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 11 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 21 |