NH HB1415 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 349; I. Sec 1 eff 01/01/2019;II. Rem eff 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 349; I. Sec 1 eff 01/01/2019;II. Rem eff 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a death benefit for a school employee killed in the line of duty and making an appropriation to the public school infrastructure fund.
Title
Establishing a death benefit for a school employee killed in the line of duty and making an appropriation to the public school infrastructure fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. James Grenier [R] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
Rep. Patricia Cornell [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - Adopt CofC (Y: 262 N: 76 NV: 27 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Suspension of Rule 3-17 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 176 N: 161 NV: 28 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Suspension of Rule 3-17 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 176 N: 161 NV: 28 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 349; I. Sec 1 eff 01/01/2019;II. Rem eff 07/02/2018 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2118e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2118e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2028c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 262-76 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2028c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2028c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Morse Replaces Senator Daniels; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-11 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/16/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Daniels, Bradley, D'Allesandro; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Proulx, H. Marsh, Goley, L. Ober 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1791s and Requests CofC (Reps. McGuire, Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1791s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-1791s, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Amendment Adopted; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Without Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2018-1791s; 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Chair Ruled Sections of Amendment # 2018-1791s Non-Germane, 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Offered Floor Amendment # 2018-1791s; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Without Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2018-1791s; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Objected to the Suspension of Senate Rule 3-17; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Suspend Rule 3-17 to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2018-1791s; Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Failed, Lacking 2/3 Necessary; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Chair Ruled Sections of Amendment # 2018-1791s Non-Germane, 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Offered Floor Amendment # 2018-1791s; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Introduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0897h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 43 |
2018-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-0897h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 43 |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0897h for 03/21/2018 (Vote 26-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 20 |
2018-03-05 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division I Work Session: 03/09/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-02-21 | House | ==RECESSED== Division I Work Session: 03/01/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Finance 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 40 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0398h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 176-161 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 38 |
2018-02-08 | House | Amendment # 2018-0398h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 37 |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-01-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0398h for 02/07/2018 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 22 |
2018-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 10 |