NH HB1417 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the use or collection of biometric data.
Title
Prohibiting the use or collection of biometric data.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Thompson [D] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. Ryan Buchanan [D] | Rep. Joe Schapiro [D] |
Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Elaine French [D] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0989h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 114 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0989h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 114 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0989h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 37 |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 21 |