NH HB1418 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 350; I. Sec 2 eff 11/01/2018;II. Rem eff 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 350; I. Sec 2 eff 11/01/2018;II. Rem eff 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative establishing a commission to study greater transparency in pharmaceutical costs and drug rebate programs.
Title
Relative establishing a commission to study greater transparency in pharmaceutical costs and drug rebate programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - OTPA (Y: 312 N: 17 NV: 27 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 350; I. Sec 2 eff 11/01/2018;II. Rem eff 07/02/2018 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2107e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2107e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1599s (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1599s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1599s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1599s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/20/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0782h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 312-17 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 66 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0782h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 66 |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0782h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 37 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 10 |