NH HB1425 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the department of environmental services to publish an advisory to public schools on the risks associated the use of food containers containing polyfluoralkyl substances and polystyrene and establishing a committee to study how to remove food containers containing polyfluoroalkyl substances and polystyrene from schools
Title
Directing the department of environmental services to publish an advisory to public schools on the risks associated the use of food containers containing polyfluoralkyl substances and polystyrene and establishing a committee to study how to remove food containers containing polyfluoroalkyl substances and polystyrene from schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0755h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 58 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0755h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 58 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0755h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 27 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 21 |