NH HB1427 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the authorization for OHRV use on certain sections of state highway.
Title
Removing the authorization for OHRV use on certain sections of state highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 36 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 37 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 22 |