NH HB1436 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to autism spectrum disorder insurance coverage.
Title
Relative to autism spectrum disorder insurance coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 7 |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 6 |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 22 |