NH HB1439 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requirements for private schools that contract with school districts.
Title
Relative to requirements for private schools that contract with school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | House | Executive Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207 |
2018-09-06 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-08-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 10/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building207 |
2018-03-06 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 23 |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 13 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 10 |