NH HB1450 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 247; 8/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 247; 8/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to retention of job applications and personnel files.
Title
Relative to retention of job applications and personnel files.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Keans [D] | Rep. Michael Cahill [D] | Rep. James Belanger [R] | Rep. Franklin Sterling [R] |
Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 247; 8/11/2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1633s (Rep. J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1633s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1633s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1633s, 04/26/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 51 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 29 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 11 |