NH HB1450 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the powers of the zoning board of adjustment.
Title
Relative to the powers of the zoning board of adjustment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 16 |
2020-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/13/2020 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 6 |
2020-01-14 | House | Executive Session: 01/22/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 22 |