NH HB1456 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a PFAs testing program for pregnant women.
Title
Relative to a PFAs testing program for pregnant women.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. David Welch [R] | Rep. Dennis Green [R] | Rep. Mark Pearson [R] |
Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 33 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 19 |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2020 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 23 |