NH HB1457 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to drug take-back programs.
Title
Relative to drug take-back programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Victoria Sullivan [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Rep. Sean Morrison [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] |
Rep. Werner Horn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 13 |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/22/2018 (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 10 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 11 |