NH HB1457 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/10/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99566391883 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/10/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99566391883 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring election officers and supervisors of the checklist to visit skilled nursing facilities and elderly and disabled residences within their jurisdiction for the purpose of assisting with voter registration and casting absentee ballots.
Title
Requiring election officers and supervisors of the checklist to visit skilled nursing facilities and elderly and disabled residences within their jurisdiction for the purpose of assisting with voter registration and casting absentee ballots.
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Prudhomme-O'Brien [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Kathleen Hoelzel [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] |
Rep. Nicole Klein-Knight [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/10/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99566391883 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-02-19 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 10 |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 6 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 23 |