NH HB1458 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing towns and cities to establish special assessment districts.
Title
Authorizing towns and cities to establish special assessment districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-0) |
2014-10-08 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 10:35 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-10-08 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/14/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-10-07 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 10/7/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-10-03 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/7/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-09-15 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 10:35 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-03-19 | House | Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/20/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Municipal and County Government |