NH HB1485 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/15/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/95529579162 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/15/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/95529579162 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the installation of video surveillance cameras in community homes and group homes.
Title
Relative to the installation of video surveillance cameras in community homes and group homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/15/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/95529579162 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-03-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 29 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 16 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 24 |