NH HB1492 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-59; House Journal 26, PG.1644-1646
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-59; House Journal 26, PG.1644-1646
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring employers to verify an employee's eligibility to work in the United States.
Title
Requiring employers to verify an employee's eligibility to work in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Cox [R] | Rep. Joe Duarte [R] | Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Rep. Daniel Tamburello [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - ITL (Y: 226 N: 59 NV: 61 Abs: 51) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-59; House Journal 26, PG.1644-1646 | |
2012-03-07 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Duarte); House Journal 21, PG.1285 | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1144 | |
2012-02-16 | House Full Committee Work Session: 2/21/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2012-02-08 | House Full Committee Work Session: 2/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Representatives Hall | |
2012-01-18 | House Public Hearing: 1/26/2012 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-12-01 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 7, PG. 357 |