NH HB1492 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regarding individual privacy when law enforcement agencies use body-worn cameras.
Title
Regarding individual privacy when law enforcement agencies use body-worn cameras.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 12 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 8 |
2016-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 16 |