NH HB1496 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 352; I. Sec 1 eff as prov in sec 5;II. Rem eff 08/31/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 352; I. Sec 1 eff as prov in sec 5;II. Rem eff 08/31/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requirements for performance based accountability for an adequate education and relative to reporting requirements for the civics competency assessment.
Title
Relative to requirements for performance based accountability for an adequate education and relative to reporting requirements for the civics competency assessment.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Terry Wolf [R] | Rep. James Grenier [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] |
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 352; I. Sec 1 eff as prov in sec 5;II. Rem eff 08/31/2018 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2115e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2115e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2044c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2044c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2044c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/16/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Ward, Watters; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Ladd, T. Wolf, V. Sullivan, Shaw 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1249s and 1593s and Requests CofC (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-1249s and 2018-1593s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment # 2018-1593s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1249s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1249s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:35 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0768h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 25 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0768h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 25 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0768h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 13 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-24 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:50 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 12 |