NH HB1501 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 300; Eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 300; Eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regulation of consultants for games of bingo and lucky 7.
Title
Relative to regulation of consultants for games of bingo and lucky 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 300; Eff. 8/24/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2011c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2011c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2011c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/15/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Giuda, Feltes; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Major, Abrami, Barnes, Ames 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1631s and Requests CofC (Rep. Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1631s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1631s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1631s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1631s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0589h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 59 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0589h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 59 |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0589h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 34 |
2018-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2018-02-01 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2018-01-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 13 |