NH HB1503 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study and monitor air emissions of PFAS.
Title
Establishing a committee to study and monitor air emissions of PFAS.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 62 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 16-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 29 |
2020-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 24 |