NH HB1507 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to public notice requirements for permits issued by the department of environmental services.
Title
Relative to public notice requirements for permits issued by the department of environmental services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0951h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 23 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0951h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 23 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0951h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 14 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-02-18 | House | Public Hearing: 02/27/2020 03:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 24 |