NH HB1510 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enabling municipalities to adopt a property tax exemption for qualifying accessory dwelling units.
Title
Enabling municipalities to adopt a property tax exemption for qualifying accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 19 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 13 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 25 |