NH HB1517 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to roadable aircraft.
Title
Relative to roadable aircraft.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. Jason Osborne [R] | Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0903h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 64 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0903h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 64 |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0903h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 31 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-02-18 | House | Public Hearing: 02/25/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 25 |