NH HB1520 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to ballots and relative to verification counts of machine-counted ballots.
Title
Relative to access to ballots and relative to verification counts of machine-counted ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 31 |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 16 |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 13 |