NH HB1521 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 186; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of an emergency for a special assessment in a condominium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of an emergency for a special assessment in a condominium.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 186; Eff. 8/7/2018
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-02SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
2018-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-03SenateHearing: 04/24/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 16
2018-03-28SenateIntroduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-22HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0467h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 8
2018-03-22HouseFLAM # 2018-0904h (NT) (Rep. Webb): Amendment Failed DV 92-234 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 7
2018-03-22HouseAmendment # 2018-0467h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 7
2018-03-16HouseSuspend House Rule 65; extending deadline for action to 3/22/2018 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 69
2018-03-08HouseSpecial Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49
2018-03-08HouseSuspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125
2018-03-06HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Webb) 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4
2018-02-26HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0467h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 7
2018-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302
2018-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback