NH HB1522 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring colleges and universities to establish a memorandum of understanding governing issues related to sexual assault.
Title
Requiring colleges and universities to establish a memorandum of understanding governing issues related to sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0877h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 18 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0877h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 18 |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0877h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 12 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/25/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 25 |