NH HB153 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB153
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to circumstances under which police officer disciplinary records shall be public documents.
Title
Relative to circumstances under which police officer disciplinary records shall be public documents.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Berch [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:20 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0374h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2019-0374h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2019-02-28 | House | Special Order to 03/07/2019 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 62 |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0374h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 31 |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-31 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 39 |
Same As/Similar To
HB153 (Carry Over) 2019-12-03 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study