NH HB1530 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 250; Eff. 8/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 250; Eff. 8/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring criminal history records checks for applicants for allied health professional licensure or certification.
Title
Requiring criminal history records checks for applicants for allied health professional licensure or certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 250; Eff. 8/11/2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1778s (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1778s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1778s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1778s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0807h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 36 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0807h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 36 |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0807h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 20 |
2018-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/09/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 14 |