NH HB1537 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to standards for per and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS) in drinking water and ambient groundwater.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to standards for per and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS) in drinking water and ambient groundwater.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0433h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 60
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0433h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 60
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0433h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 27
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2020-01-22HousePublic Hearing: 02/04/2020 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 26

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback