NH HB1538 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1915s (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1915s (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limiting the liability of successor corporations for asbestos-related claims.
Title
Limiting the liability of successor corporations for asbestos-related claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Sen. Gannon Floor Amendment 1915s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1915s (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1915s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Floor Amendment # 2018-1915s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Withdraws his objection to Senate Rule 3-17; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Objected to the Suspension of Senate Rule 3-17; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Without Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2018-1915s; 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Chair Ruled Sections of Amendment # 2018-1915s Non-Germane, 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Offered Floor Amendment # 2018-1915s; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 15 |
2018-01-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 17 |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 14 |