NH HB1540 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to ranked-choice voting.
Title
Relative to ranked-choice voting.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Charlotte DiLorenzo [D] | Rep. Sherry Frost [D] | Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] |
Rep. Steven Rand [D] | Rep. Keith Ammon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 31 |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 16 |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 14 |