NH HB1542 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 231-110 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 231-110 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to carrying a pistol or revolver on university system and community college system property.
Title
Relative to carrying a pistol or revolver on university system and community college system property.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - ITL (Y: 231 N: 110 NV: 13 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 231-110 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 28 |
2018-02-22 | House | Special Order to regular place on the next calendar (Rep. Horn): Motion Failed DV 131-207 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 28 |
2018-01-31 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0044h (NT) |
2018-01-31 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/22/2018 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 16 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/16/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 14 |