NH HB1545 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regulation of interpreters for the deaf, deaf blind, and hard of hearing.
Title
Relative to regulation of interpreters for the deaf, deaf blind, and hard of hearing.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Pearson [R] | Rep. Gary Woods [D] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Gary Merchant [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Larry Gagne [R] | Rep. Norman Major [R] |
Rep. Jon Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 29 |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 17 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 26 |