NH HB155 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to procedures for determining and disclosing exculpatory evidence in a police officer's personnel file.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to procedures for determining and disclosing exculpatory evidence in a police officer's personnel file.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2019, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0746h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 7
2019-03-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0746h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 7
2019-03-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0746h for 03/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 4
2019-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-02-05House==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-31HouseVacated and Referred to Judiciary (): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 2
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 39

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback