NH HB1550 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extending accidental death benefits for group II members of the retirement system suffering from heart attacks.
Title
Extending accidental death benefits for group II members of the retirement system suffering from heart attacks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 30 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 17 |
2020-02-18 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-02-05 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 26 |