NH HB1553 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to removal of trees from state property.
Title
Relative to removal of trees from state property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 36 |
2018-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 20 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-09 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 14 |