NH HB156 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2019; Chapter 149; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2019; Chapter 149; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the establishment of a state department of energy.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the establishment of a state department of energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2019; Chapter 149; I. Sec. 2 Eff: 11/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 07/01/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2376e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 42 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2376e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0388h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 28 |
2019-03-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0388h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 28 |
2019-03-07 | House | Special Order to 03/14/2019 Without Objection House Journal 8 P. 60 |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0388h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 17 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 39 |