NH HB1562 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Including soil health and soil conservation in the state soil conservation plan.
Title
Including soil health and soil conservation in the state soil conservation plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Bixby [D] | Rep. Craig Thompson [D] | Rep. Sparky von Plinsky [D] | Rep. Wayne Moynihan [D] |
Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0915h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 219 |
2020-03-13 | House | Amendment # 2020-0915h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 219 |
2020-03-11 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Sylvia) 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 2 |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0915h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 14 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 27 |