NH HB1564 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-122; House Journal 24, PG.1340-1342

Summary

Relative to the regulation of attorneys by the supreme court and eliminating the requirement that the county attorney be a member of the New Hampshire bar.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the regulation of attorneys by the supreme court and eliminating the requirement that the county attorney be a member of the New Hampshire bar.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-11 House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-122; House Journal 24, PG.1340-1342
2010-03-10 House Special Ordered to Regular Place on Mar 11 Calendar, Without Objection; House Journal 23, PG.1294
2010-02-10 House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 19, PG.1032
2010-02-10 House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 10 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1032
2010-01-26 House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2010-01-06 House Public Hearing: 1/21/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2009-12-10 House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 6, PG.244

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback