NH HB1564 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study and recommend solutions for simplifying the calculation of the cost of public education through the combination of adequate education, school building aid, and catastrophic aid funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study and recommend solutions for simplifying the calculation of the cost of public education through the combination of adequate education, school building aid, and catastrophic aid funding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-07 House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1324
2012-02-23 House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 11-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1076-1077
2012-02-07 House Full Committee Work Session: 2/13/2012 10:10 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2012-01-18 House Public Hearing: 2/3/2012 9:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==Executive Session Will Follow==
2011-12-16 House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Special Committee on Education Funding Reform; House Journal 7, PG. 360

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback