NH HB1564 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Div 282-9 (Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to escheat proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to escheat proceedings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-25HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Div 282-9 (Consent Calendar)
2014-03-21HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 25 (Vote 24-0; Consent Calendar)
2014-03-12HouseExecutive Session: 3/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211
2014-03-06HouseDivision I Work Session: 3/10/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212
2014-03-06HouseReferred to Finance
2014-03-06HouseRules Suspension (Reps. Shurtleff, Chandler) Adopted by Necessary 2/3 Vote
2014-03-06HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2014-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 8-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13
2014-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 2/18/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2014-01-22HousePublic Hearing: 1/30/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-12-17HouseIntroduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback