NH HB1564 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-151 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing an independent redistricting commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an independent redistricting commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-10 - House - ITL (Y: 210 N: 151 NV: 12 Abs: 26) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-10HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-151 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 19
2016-02-05HouseMinority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study House Calendar 7 P. 9
2016-02-05HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/10/2016 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 9
2016-02-08HouseExecutive Session: 02/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2016-01-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2016 09:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2016-01-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/19/2016 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building308
2016-01-07HousePublic Hearing: 01/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building308
2016-02-11HouseIntroduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 4 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback