NH HB1571 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the qualifications for the members of the fish and game commission.
Title
Relative to the qualifications for the members of the fish and game commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Ryan Buchanan [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] | Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] |
Rep. Mary Eisner [D] | Rep. Kathryn Stack [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Table (Y: 183 N: 126 NV: 40 Abs: 47) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-03-12 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Klose): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 183-126 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 105 |
2020-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 56 |
2020-02-19 | House | Public Hearing on Amendment # 2020-0664h: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2020-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2020-02-05 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 1 P. 27 |