NH HB1588 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to meetings of the board of directors and committees of the condominium association.
Title
Relative to meetings of the board of directors and committees of the condominium association.
Sponsors
Rep. James Webb [R] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] | Rep. Claire Rouillard [R] |
Rep. Richard Tripp [R] | Rep. Donna Ellis [D] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 12 |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 7 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 16 |